Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB860 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.B. No. 860


 AN ACT
 relating to the exclusion of certain car haulers from the
 definition of tow truck for purposes of certain laws regulating
 motor vehicle towing.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2308.002(11), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (11)  "Tow truck" means a motor vehicle, including a
 wrecker, equipped with a mechanical device used to tow, winch, or
 otherwise move another motor vehicle.  The term does not include:
 (A)  a motor vehicle owned and operated by a
 governmental entity, including a public school district;
 (B)  a motor vehicle towing:
 (i)  a race car;
 (ii)  a motor vehicle for exhibition; or
 (iii)  an antique motor vehicle;
 (C)  a recreational vehicle towing another
 vehicle;
 (D)  a motor vehicle used in combination with a
 tow bar, tow dolly, or other mechanical device if the vehicle is not
 operated in the furtherance of a commercial enterprise;
 (E)  a motor vehicle that is controlled or
 operated by a farmer or rancher and used for towing a farm vehicle;
 (F)  a motor vehicle that:
 (i)  is owned or operated by an entity the
 primary business of which is the rental of motor vehicles; and
 (ii)  only tows vehicles rented by the
 entity;
 (G)  a truck-trailer combination that is owned or
 operated by a dealer licensed under Chapter 2301 and used to
 transport new vehicles during the normal course of a documented
 transaction in which the dealer is a party and ownership or the
 right of possession of the transported vehicle is conveyed or
 transferred; or
 (H)  a car hauler that is used solely to
 transport, other than in a consent or nonconsent tow, motor
 vehicles as cargo:
 (i)  in the course of:
 (a)  a prearranged shipping
 transaction; or
 (b)  a commercial transaction for
 transport of a damaged vehicle arranged or authorized by an
 insurance company and delivered to a salvage pool operator as
 defined by Section 2302.001; or
 (ii)  for use in mining, drilling, or
 construction operations.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 860 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 860 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 2, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor