Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB874 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 31, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2021
Bill March 31, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 22, 2021