4 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 7 | | relating to the reporting and expiration dates of a temporary |
---|
6 | 8 | | health insurance risk pool administered by the commissioner of |
---|
7 | 9 | | insurance. |
---|
8 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Section 1510.012(a), Insurance Code, is amended |
---|
10 | 12 | | to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 13 | | (a) Beginning June 1, 2022 [2020], not later than June 1 of |
---|
12 | 14 | | each year, the department shall submit a report to the governor, the |
---|
13 | 15 | | lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of |
---|
14 | 16 | | representatives. |
---|
15 | 17 | | SECTION 2. Section 1510.013, Insurance Code, is amended to |
---|
16 | 18 | | read as follows: |
---|
17 | 19 | | Sec. 1510.013. EXPIRATION OF CHAPTER. This chapter expires |
---|
18 | 20 | | August 31, 2023 [2021]. |
---|
19 | 21 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
20 | 22 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
21 | 23 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
22 | 24 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
23 | 25 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
24 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
25 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
26 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 874 passed the Senate on |
---|
27 | | - | April 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
28 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
29 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
30 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 874 passed the House on |
---|
31 | | - | May 20, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 9, one |
---|
32 | | - | present not voting. |
---|
33 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
34 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
35 | | - | Approved: |
---|
36 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
37 | | - | Date |
---|
38 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
39 | | - | Governor |
---|