Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB877 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/06/2021

                    By: Hancock S.B. No. 877
 (In the Senate - Filed March 1, 2021; March 11, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 6, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 6, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 877 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the inspection of municipal buildings during a declared
 disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 214, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 214.220 to read as follows:
 Sec. 214.220.  INSPECTION DURING DECLARED DISASTER. (a)  In
 an area of a municipality that is subject to a declaration of
 disaster by the governor under Chapter 418, Government Code, or a
 declaration of local disaster under that chapter, a building
 inspection for compliance with this subchapter or related municipal
 regulations may, while the declaration is in effect, be performed
 by:
 (1)  a person certified to inspect buildings by the
 International Code Council;
 (2)  a person employed as a building inspector by the
 municipality in which the building is located; or
 (3)  a person employed as a building inspector by any
 political subdivision, if the municipality in which the building is
 located has approved the person to perform inspections during a
 disaster.
 (b)  A municipality may not collect an additional inspection
 fee related to the inspection of a building performed under
 Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *