Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB877 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 23, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis March 31, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 23, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note May 3, 2021
Fiscal Note April 1, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021