Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB877 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.B. No. 877


 AN ACT
 relating to the inspection of municipal buildings during a declared
 disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 214, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 214.220 to read as follows:
 Sec. 214.220.  INSPECTION DURING DECLARED DISASTER. (a)  In
 an area of a municipality that is subject to a declaration of
 disaster by the governor under Chapter 418, Government Code, or a
 declaration of local disaster under that chapter, a building
 inspection for compliance with this subchapter or related municipal
 regulations may, while the declaration is in effect, be performed
 by a person:
 (1)  other than:
 (A)  the owner of the building; or
 (B)  a person whose work is the subject of the
 inspection; and
 (2)  who is:
 (A)  certified to inspect buildings by the
 International Code Council;
 (B)  employed as a building inspector by the
 municipality in which the building is located;
 (C)  employed as a building inspector by any
 political subdivision, if the municipality in which the building is
 located has approved the person to perform inspections during a
 disaster; or
 (D)  an engineer licensed under Chapter 1001,
 Occupations Code.
 (b)  A municipality may not collect an additional inspection
 fee related to the inspection of a building performed under
 Subsection (a).
 (c)  A person who performs an inspection under this section
 must:
 (1)  comply with the municipality's building inspection
 regulations and policies; and
 (2)  not later than the 30th day after the date of the
 inspection, provide notice to the municipality of the inspection.
 (d)  The municipality may prescribe a reasonable format for
 the notice provided under Subsection (c)(2).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 877 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 877 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor