Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB901 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.B. No. 901


 AN ACT
 relating to the enforcement of commercial motor vehicle safety
 standards in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 644.101(c), Transportation Code, as
 amended by Chapters 169 (H.B. 917) and 478 (H.B. 511), Acts of the
 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019, is reenacted and amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  A sheriff or a deputy sheriff of any of the following
 counties is eligible to apply for certification under this section:
 (1)  a county bordering the United Mexican States;
 (2)  a county with a population of less than 1,000, part
 of which is located within 75 miles of an international border; [or]
 (3) [(2)]  a county with a population of 700,000 or
 more; [or]
 (4) [(3)]  a county with a population of 400,000 or
 more that borders the county in which the State Capitol is located;
 (5)  a county:
 (A)  any part of which is within 30 miles of New
 Mexico; and
 (B)  that is adjacent to two or more counties that
 generated $100 million or more in tax revenue collected under
 Chapters 201 and 202, Tax Code, from oil and gas production during
 the preceding state fiscal year; or
 (6)  a county with a population of more than 40,000 and
 less than 300,000 that is adjacent to a county described by
 Subdivision (4).
 SECTION 2.  To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
 over another Act of the 87th Legislature, Regular Session, 2021,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 901 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 901 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 11, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 3, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor