Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB916 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.B. No. 916


 AN ACT
 relating to certain information regarding appraisal district
 noncompliance and property values in the Texas Department of
 Licensing and Regulation records of a professional property tax
 appraiser serving as chief appraiser for the district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 1151, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1151.109 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1151.109.  INFORMATION ON APPRAISAL DISTRICT REVIEWS.
 (a)  The commission by rule shall require the department to include
 in the record of the registered professional appraiser who serves
 as chief appraiser for an appraisal district at the time the
 comptroller finalizes the biennial review of the appraisal
 district's performance under Section 5.102(c), Tax Code, an
 electronic link to:
 (1)  the comptroller's report for the review; and
 (2)  each property value study the comptroller conducts
 under Subchapter M, Chapter 403, Government Code, that is used in
 the review.
 (b)  An appraisal district may request from the department
 information on a registered professional appraiser whom the board
 of directors of the appraisal district is considering for
 appointment as chief appraiser of the appraisal district. The
 department shall inform the requestor of the status of any
 compliance efforts of an appraisal district under Section 5.102(d),
 Tax Code, for previous reviews in which the appraiser served as
 chief appraiser of that appraisal district.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall
 adopt rules to implement Section 1151.109, Occupations Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 916 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 916 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 25, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 3, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor