Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB959 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.B. No. 959


 AN ACT
 relating to student success-based funding recommendations for
 certain continuing workforce education courses offered by public
 junior colleges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.0593, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f-1) to read as follows:
 (f-1)  In making its recommendations under Subsection (f)
 relating to institutional appropriations of incentive funds for
 public junior colleges based on achievement on student success
 measures, the board, in the manner and to the extent the board
 considers appropriate and in consultation with those colleges,
 shall incorporate the consideration of student success measures,
 and include appropriate funding recommendations based on those
 success measures, achieved in qualified continuing workforce
 education courses offered by those colleges for which credit toward
 a certificate or associate's degree is not awarded.  For purposes of
 this subsection, a continuing workforce education course is
 considered qualified if the course is consistent with the role and
 mission of a public junior college and is designed to prepare
 students with skills necessary to attain external workforce
 credentials, including a certification or license, or employment in
 a specific high-demand occupation, regardless of whether the course
 is part of a recognized sequence of courses that requires a specific
 number of contact hours.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 959 passed the Senate on
 April 14, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 959 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 120,
 Nays 26, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor