Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB967 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 967


 AN ACT
 relating to the expiration and extension of certain public health
 orders issued by a health authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 121, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 121.026 to read as follows:
 Sec. 121.026.  EXPIRATION AND EXTENSION OF CERTAIN PUBLIC
 HEALTH ORDERS ISSUED BY HEALTH AUTHORITY. (a)  This section applies
 only to a public health order imposed on more than one individual,
 animal, place, or object.
 (b)  A public health order issued by a health authority under
 this chapter or other law expires on the 15th day following the date
 the order is issued unless, before the 15th day by majority vote:
 (1)  the governing body of a municipality or the
 commissioners court of a county that appointed the health authority
 extends the order for a longer period; or
 (2)  if the health authority is jointly appointed by a
 municipality and county, the commissioner's court of the county
 extends the order for a longer period.
 SECTION 2.  Section 121.026, Health and Safety Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to a public health order issued by a
 health authority on or after the effective date of this Act. A
 public health order issued by a health authority before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect when the
 public health order was issued, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 967 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendments on May 30, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 967 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 4, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor