Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB985 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 8, 2021
Fiscal Note April 5, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 7, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021