Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB985 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Buckingham, Zaffirini S.B. No. 985
1+By: Buckingham S.B. No. 985
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
4+ April 9, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 9, 2021,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 985 By: Johnson
29
310
411 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
512 AN ACT
613 relating to reports by the Public Utility Commission of Texas on the
714 ability of electric generators to respond to abnormal weather
815 conditions.
916 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1017 SECTION 1. The heading to Section 186.007, Utilities Code,
1118 is amended to read as follows:
1219 Sec. 186.007. WEATHER EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS REPORTS
1320 [REPORT].
1421 SECTION 2. Sections 186.007(a-1), (b), (d), (e), and (f),
1522 Utilities Code, are amended to read as follows:
1623 (a-1) The commission shall analyze emergency operations
1724 plans developed by electric utilities as defined by Section 31.002,
1825 power generation companies, municipally owned utilities, and
1926 electric cooperatives that operate generation facilities in this
2027 state and prepare a weather emergency preparedness report on power
2128 generation weatherization preparedness. In preparing the report,
2229 the commission shall:
2330 (1) review the emergency operations plans currently on
2431 file with the commission;
2532 (2) analyze and determine the ability of the electric
2633 grid to withstand extreme weather events in the upcoming year,
2734 including weather events that have only a one percent or two percent
2835 chance of occurring in the upcoming year;
2936 (3) consider the anticipated weather patterns for the
3037 upcoming year as forecasted by the National Weather Service or any
3138 similar state or national agency; and
3239 (4) make recommendations on improving emergency
3340 operations plans and procedures in order to ensure the continuity
3441 of electric service.
3542 (b) The commission shall [may] require an electric
3643 generation entity subject to this section to file an updated
3744 emergency operations plan if it finds that an emergency operations
3845 plan on file does not contain adequate information to determine
3946 whether the electric generation entity can provide adequate
4047 electric generation services.
4148 (d) The commission shall submit the report described by
4249 Subsection (a-1) to the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
4350 house of representatives, and the members of the legislature not
4451 later than September 30 of each even-numbered year[, 2012].
4552 (e) The commission may submit additional [subsequent]
4653 weather emergency preparedness reports if the commission finds that
4754 significant changes to weatherization techniques have occurred or
4855 are necessary to protect consumers or vital services, or if there
4956 have been changes to statutes or rules relating to weatherization
5057 requirements. A report under this subsection must be submitted not
5158 later than:
5259 (1) March 1 for a summer weather emergency
5360 preparedness report; and
5461 (2) September 1 for a winter weather emergency
5562 preparedness report.
5663 (f) The emergency operations plans submitted for a [the]
5764 report described by Subsection (a-1) and any additional
5865 [subsequent] plans submitted under Subsection (e) are public
5966 information except for the portions of the plan considered
6067 confidential under Chapter 552, Government Code, or other state or
6168 federal law. If portions of a plan are designated as confidential,
6269 the plan shall be provided to the commission in a redacted form for
6370 public inspection with the confidential portions removed. An
6471 electric generation entity within the ERCOT power region shall
6572 provide the entity's plan to ERCOT in its entirety.
6673 SECTION 3. The first report described by Section
6774 186.007(a-1), Utilities Code, as amended by this Act, is due
6875 September 30, 2022.
6976 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
7077 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
7178 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
7279 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
7380 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
81+ * * * * *