Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB993 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2021

                    By: Hancock S.B. No. 993
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 May 10, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 10, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 993 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the practice of therapeutic optometry.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 351, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 351.2034 to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.2034.  COMPLAINTS RESULTING FROM GLAUCOMA
 TREATMENT. (a)  The board, in collaboration with the Texas Medical
 Board, shall adopt rules for investigating and reviewing complaints
 filed with the board regarding a therapeutic optometrist's
 treatment of a patient for glaucoma. The rules must ensure that:
 (1)  a person who files a complaint has the opportunity
 to explain the allegations made in the complaint;
 (2)  a complaint is not dismissed without appropriate
 consideration by the board;
 (3)  a complaint is resolved within six months after
 the date the complaint is filed;
 (4)  the board notifies the Texas Medical Board of the
 receipt and disposition of a complaint; and
 (5)  a complaint is reviewed as provided by this
 section.
 (b)  After a complaint regarding a therapeutic optometrist's
 treatment of a patient for glaucoma is filed with the board, the
 board shall select at least one physician licensed in this state who
 specializes in ophthalmology to:
 (1)  review the complaint and determine if the
 therapeutic optometrist's treatment of the patient for glaucoma
 violated the standard of care applicable to a physician
 specializing in ophthalmology; and
 (2)  submit to the board a written report on the
 physician's determination.
 (c)  If the report under Subsection (b) states that the
 standard of care was violated, the board shall forward the
 complaint and report to an expert panel appointed by the board and
 the Texas Medical Board. The panel must be composed of an equal
 number of physicians who specialize in ophthalmology and
 therapeutic optometrists. Each member of the expert panel must be
 licensed to practice medicine or therapeutic optometry, as
 applicable, in this state. A physician who serves on an expert
 panel may also serve as an expert physician for the Texas Medical
 Board.
 (d)  An expert panel selected to review a complaint under
 Subsection (c) shall:
 (1)  review the physician's determination made under
 Subsection (b); and
 (2)  recommend to the board whether the therapeutic
 optometrist should be subject to disciplinary action and, if so,
 whether the disciplinary action should include suspension or
 revocation of the therapeutic optometrist's certificate issued
 under Section 351.3581(a).
 (e)  A person is not eligible to review a complaint under
 Subsection (b) or serve on an expert panel under Subsection (c) if:
 (1)  the person or the person's spouse is an officer,
 employee, or paid consultant of a Texas trade association, as
 defined by Section 351.053, in the field of health care; or
 (2)  the person is a member of the faculty or board of
 trustees of an optometry school or an institution of higher
 education with an affiliated school of optometry.
 (f)  The board shall maintain and make publicly available
 online:
 (1)  information regarding the number of complaints
 filed with the board regarding the treatment of patients for
 glaucoma by therapeutic optometrists and the disposition of those
 complaints; and
 (2)  a searchable list of each therapeutic optometrist
 whose certificate under Section 351.3581(a) was suspended or
 revoked by the board.
 (g)  This section expires September 1, 2027.
 SECTION 2.  Section 351.358(c), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  A therapeutic optometrist may prescribe not more than
 [oral medications only in the following classifications of oral
 pharmaceuticals:
 [(1)  one 10-day supply of oral antibiotics;
 [(2)  one 72-hour supply of oral antihistamines;
 [(3)  one seven-day supply of oral nonsteroidal
 anti-inflammatories;
 [(4)]  one three-day supply of any medication
 classified as a controlled substance under Schedule [analgesic
 identified in Schedules] III, IV, or [and] V of 21 U.S.C. Section
 812[; and
 [(5)  any other oral pharmaceutical recommended by the
 Optometric Health Care Advisory Committee and approved by the board
 and the Texas State Board of Medical Examiners].
 SECTION 3.  The heading to Section 351.3581, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 351.3581.  [DIAGNOSIS AND] TREATMENT OF GLAUCOMA.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 351.3581(a) and (d), Occupations Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A therapeutic optometrist may not administer or
 prescribe an oral or parenteral medication or treat glaucoma unless
 the therapeutic optometrist holds a certificate issued by the
 board. A therapeutic optometrist certified under this section
 [subsection] shall be known as an optometric glaucoma specialist.
 To obtain a certificate, a therapeutic optometrist must [as
 required under Section 351.165(c)]:
 (1)  complete an instructional clinical review course;
 and
 (2)  pass an examination approved by the board.
 (d)  A therapeutic optometrist shall refer a patient to an
 ophthalmologist if:
 (1)  the patient is younger than 16 years of age and has
 been diagnosed as having glaucoma;
 (2)  the patient has been diagnosed as having acute
 closed angle glaucoma;
 (3)  the patient has been diagnosed as having malignant
 glaucoma or neovascular glaucoma;
 (4)  the patient has definite optic disc, retinal nerve
 fiber layer, or macular imaging abnormalities consistent with
 glaucoma and visual field abnormalities in both hemifields, or loss
 within five degrees of fixation in at least one hemifield as tested
 with standard automated perimetry [therapeutic optometrist
 determines that a patient's glaucoma is caused by a diabetic
 complication and, after joint consultation with the physician
 treating the diabetes and an ophthalmologist by telephone, fax, or
 another method, the physician or ophthalmologist determines that
 the patient should be seen by the physician or ophthalmologist]; or
 (5)  the therapeutic optometrist determines that a
 patient's glaucoma is not responding [appropriately] to
 nonsurgical intervention [a treatment specified in Subsection (f)
 and, after consulting a physician by telephone, fax, or another
 method, the physician determines that the patient should be seen by
 the physician or an appropriate specialist].
 SECTION 5.  Not later than December 1, 2021, the Texas
 Optometry Board shall adopt rules necessary to implement the
 changes in law made by this Act to Chapter 351, Occupations Code.
 SECTION 6.  Sections 351.3581(b) and (c), Occupations Code,
 are repealed.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *