Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB993 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 4, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 13, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 27, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2021
Bill May 10, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note March 22, 2021