Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB993 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.B. No. 993
1+By: Hancock, et al. S.B. No. 993
2+ (Klick, Canales, et al.)
23
34
5+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
46 AN ACT
57 relating to the practice of therapeutic optometry.
68 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
79 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 351, Occupations Code, is
810 amended by adding Section 351.2034 to read as follows:
911 Sec. 351.2034. COMPLAINTS RESULTING FROM GLAUCOMA
1012 TREATMENT. (a) The board, in collaboration with the Texas Medical
1113 Board, shall adopt rules for investigating and reviewing complaints
1214 filed with the board regarding a therapeutic optometrist's
1315 treatment of a patient for glaucoma. The rules must ensure that:
1416 (1) a person who files a complaint has the opportunity
1517 to explain the allegations made in the complaint;
1618 (2) a complaint is not dismissed without appropriate
1719 consideration by the board;
1820 (3) a complaint is resolved within six months after
1921 the date the complaint is filed;
2022 (4) the board notifies the Texas Medical Board of the
2123 receipt and disposition of a complaint; and
2224 (5) a complaint is reviewed as provided by this
2325 section.
2426 (b) After a complaint regarding a therapeutic optometrist's
2527 treatment of a patient for glaucoma is filed with the board, the
2628 board shall select at least one physician licensed in this state who
2729 specializes in ophthalmology to:
2830 (1) review the complaint and determine if the
2931 therapeutic optometrist's treatment of the patient for glaucoma
3032 violated the standard of care applicable to a physician
3133 specializing in ophthalmology; and
3234 (2) submit to the board a written report on the
3335 physician's determination.
3436 (c) If the report under Subsection (b) states that the
3537 standard of care was violated, the board shall forward the
3638 complaint and report to an expert panel appointed by the board and
3739 the Texas Medical Board. The panel must be composed of an equal
3840 number of physicians who specialize in ophthalmology and
3941 therapeutic optometrists. Each member of the expert panel must be
4042 licensed to practice medicine or therapeutic optometry, as
4143 applicable, in this state. A physician who serves on an expert
4244 panel may also serve as an expert physician for the Texas Medical
4345 Board.
4446 (d) An expert panel selected to review a complaint under
4547 Subsection (c) shall:
4648 (1) review the physician's determination made under
4749 Subsection (b); and
4850 (2) recommend to the board whether the therapeutic
4951 optometrist should be subject to disciplinary action and, if so,
5052 whether the disciplinary action should include suspension or
5153 revocation of the therapeutic optometrist's certificate issued
5254 under Section 351.3581(a).
5355 (e) A person is not eligible to review a complaint under
5456 Subsection (b) or serve on an expert panel under Subsection (c) if:
5557 (1) the person or the person's spouse is an officer,
5658 employee, or paid consultant of a Texas trade association, as
5759 defined by Section 351.053, in the field of health care; or
5860 (2) the person is a member of the faculty or board of
5961 trustees of an optometry school or an institution of higher
6062 education with an affiliated school of optometry.
6163 (f) The board shall maintain and make publicly available
6264 online:
6365 (1) information regarding the number of complaints
6466 filed with the board regarding the treatment of patients for
6567 glaucoma by therapeutic optometrists and the disposition of those
6668 complaints; and
6769 (2) a searchable list of each therapeutic optometrist
6870 whose certificate under Section 351.3581(a) was suspended or
6971 revoked by the board.
7072 (g) This section expires September 1, 2027.
7173 SECTION 2. Section 351.358(c), Occupations Code, is amended
7274 to read as follows:
7375 (c) A therapeutic optometrist may prescribe not more than
7476 [oral medications only in the following classifications of oral
7577 pharmaceuticals:
7678 [(1) one 10-day supply of oral antibiotics;
7779 [(2) one 72-hour supply of oral antihistamines;
7880 [(3) one seven-day supply of oral nonsteroidal
7981 anti-inflammatories;
8082 [(4)] one three-day supply of any medication
8183 classified as a controlled substance under Schedule [analgesic
8284 identified in Schedules] III, IV, or [and] V of 21 U.S.C. Section
8385 812[; and
8486 [(5) any other oral pharmaceutical recommended by the
8587 Optometric Health Care Advisory Committee and approved by the board
8688 and the Texas State Board of Medical Examiners].
8789 SECTION 3. The heading to Section 351.3581, Occupations
8890 Code, is amended to read as follows:
8991 Sec. 351.3581. [DIAGNOSIS AND] TREATMENT OF GLAUCOMA.
9092 SECTION 4. Sections 351.3581(a) and (d), Occupations Code,
9193 are amended to read as follows:
9294 (a) A therapeutic optometrist may not administer or
9395 prescribe an oral or parenteral medication or treat glaucoma unless
9496 the therapeutic optometrist holds a certificate issued by the
9597 board. A therapeutic optometrist certified under this section
9698 [subsection] shall be known as an optometric glaucoma specialist.
9799 To obtain a certificate, a therapeutic optometrist must [as
98100 required under Section 351.165(c)]:
99101 (1) complete an instructional clinical review course;
100102 and
101103 (2) pass an examination approved by the board.
102104 (d) A therapeutic optometrist shall refer a patient to an
103105 ophthalmologist if:
104106 (1) the patient is younger than 16 years of age and has
105107 been diagnosed as having glaucoma;
106108 (2) the patient has been diagnosed as having acute
107109 closed angle glaucoma;
108110 (3) the patient has been diagnosed as having malignant
109111 glaucoma or neovascular glaucoma;
110112 (4) the patient has definite optic disc, retinal nerve
111113 fiber layer, or macular imaging abnormalities consistent with
112114 glaucoma and visual field abnormalities in both hemifields, or loss
113115 within five degrees of fixation in at least one hemifield as tested
114116 with standard automated perimetry [therapeutic optometrist
115117 determines that a patient's glaucoma is caused by a diabetic
116118 complication and, after joint consultation with the physician
117119 treating the diabetes and an ophthalmologist by telephone, fax, or
118120 another method, the physician or ophthalmologist determines that
119121 the patient should be seen by the physician or ophthalmologist]; or
120122 (5) the therapeutic optometrist determines that a
121123 patient's glaucoma is not responding [appropriately] to
122124 nonsurgical intervention [a treatment specified in Subsection (f)
123125 and, after consulting a physician by telephone, fax, or another
124126 method, the physician determines that the patient should be seen by
125127 the physician or an appropriate specialist].
126128 SECTION 5. Not later than December 1, 2021, the Texas
127129 Optometry Board shall adopt rules necessary to implement the
128130 changes in law made by this Act to Chapter 351, Occupations Code.
129131 SECTION 6. Sections 351.3581(b) and (c), Occupations Code,
130132 are repealed.
131133 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
132- ______________________________ ______________________________
133- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
134- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 993 passed the Senate on
135- May 13, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
136- ______________________________
137- Secretary of the Senate
138- I hereby certify that S.B. No. 993 passed the House on
139- May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 2, one present
140- not voting.
141- ______________________________
142- Chief Clerk of the House
143- Approved:
144- ______________________________
145- Date
146- ______________________________
147- Governor