Senate | 05/20/2021 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2021 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 05/11/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/11/2021 | Amended | ||
Senate | 05/11/2021 | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Powell | ||
Senate | 05/11/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 05/11/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/11/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Higher Education | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |