Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB994 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1+87R1638 KJE-D
12 By: Powell, et al. S.B. No. 994
2- (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
3- first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
4- April 29, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6,
5- Nays 3; April 29, 2021, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
73
84
95 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
106 AN ACT
117 relating to measures to facilitate the successful completion of
128 degree and certificate programs by certain adult learners at public
139 institutions of higher education.
1410 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1511 SECTION 1. Chapter 61, Education Code, is amended by adding
1612 Subchapter R to read as follows:
1713 SUBCHAPTER R. TEXAS RECOVERY ACT
1814 Sec. 61.801. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
1915 (1) "Adult learner" means a person who:
2016 (A) is at least 25 years of age but not older than
2117 34 years of age; and
2218 (B) within the preceding 48 months, has achieved
2319 at least 75 percent completion of a baccalaureate or associate
2420 degree or certificate program.
2521 (2) "Texas WORKS internship program" means the Texas
2622 Working Off-Campus: Reinforcing Knowledge and Skills (WORKS)
2723 Internship Program established under Subchapter E-1, Chapter 56.
2824 Sec. 61.802. TUITION ASSISTANCE GRANT FOR ADULT LEARNERS.
2925 (a) For the 2021-2022 and 2022-2023 academic years, the board shall
3026 provide to each adult learner enrolled in a baccalaureate or
3127 associate degree or certificate program at an institution of higher
3228 education a grant for each semester or term in the amount equal to
3329 25 percent of the average statewide amount of tuition and required
3430 fees that a resident student enrolled full-time in a baccalaureate
3531 or associate degree or certificate program, as applicable, would be
3632 charged for that semester or term at the type of institution of
3733 higher education at which the adult learner is enrolled.
3834 (b) An adult learner receiving a grant under this section
3935 may use the money only to pay the cost of tuition or required fees
4036 for the baccalaureate or associate degree or certificate program in
4137 which the adult learner is enrolled at an institution of higher
4238 education.
4339 Sec. 61.803. INCENTIVE FUNDING FOR ADULT LEARNERS. (a) For
4440 the state fiscal biennium beginning September 1, 2023, the board
4541 shall distribute incentive funding to each institution of higher
46- education based on the number of adult learners enrolled at the
42+ education based on the number of adult leaners enrolled at the
4743 institution who, during the preceding state fiscal biennium:
4844 (1) timely completed:
4945 (A) a baccalaureate or associate degree program
5046 in accordance with the adult learner's degree plan; or
5147 (B) a certificate program, as established by
5248 board rule; or
5349 (2) received a baccalaureate or associate degree or
5450 certificate in a target field, as established by board rule.
5551 (b) Subject to the availability of funds, the amount of
5652 incentive funding distributed per qualifying adult learner to an
5753 institution of higher education under this section for a state
5854 fiscal biennium may not be less than the amount of funding provided
5955 per student for that biennium for achievement of an equivalent
6056 student success measure under Section 61.0593(f), Education Code.
6157 Sec. 61.804. FINAL SEMESTER INTERNSHIPS FOR ADULT LEARNERS.
6258 (a) For the 2021-2022 and 2022-2023 academic years, the board shall
6359 collaborate with employers who participate in the Texas WORKS
6460 internship program to ensure that:
6561 (1) employers give priority in employment under that
6662 program to adult learners in the final semester of a baccalaureate
6763 or associate degree or certificate program at an institution of
6864 higher education; and
6965 (2) each adult learner employed through that program
7066 during the adult learner's final semester of a baccalaureate or
7167 associate degree or certificate program at an institution of higher
7268 education receives an additional $2,500 stipend as part of the
7369 adult learner's wages under that program.
7470 (b) The board shall certify internships provided through
7571 the Texas WORKS internship program through which an adult learner
7672 may earn course credit toward the adult learner's baccalaureate or
7773 associate degree or certificate program, as applicable.
7874 Sec. 61.805. GRAD TX PROGRAM. The board shall establish the
7975 Grad TX program in collaboration with institutions of higher
8076 education to support the reskilling, upskilling, and high-value
8177 degree or certificate program completion of adult learners. The
8278 program may include:
8379 (1) academic and career advising;
8480 (2) assistance with available student financial aid
8581 options; and
8682 (3) flexible degree or certificate programs designed
8783 for adult learners.
8884 Sec. 61.806. LIMITATION. (a) The total amount spent under
8985 this subchapter may not exceed $50 million.
9086 (b) If the total cost of providing grants, incentive
9187 funding, or stipends to all eligible adult learners or institutions
9288 of higher education under this subchapter would exceed the amount
9389 that may be spent under Subsection (a), the board shall reduce the
9490 amount of each grant, incentive funding award, and stipend as
9591 necessary to comply with that subsection.
9692 Sec. 61.807. GIFTS, GRANTS, AND DONATIONS. The board may
9793 accept gifts, grants, and donations from any public or private
9894 source for purposes of this subchapter.
9995 Sec. 61.808. REPORT. Not later than December 1 of each
10096 year, the board shall submit to the governor, the lieutenant
10197 governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives a report
10298 on the status and effectiveness of the measures established under
10399 this subchapter.
104100 Sec. 61.809. RULES. The board may adopt rules as necessary
105101 to implement this subchapter. In adopting rules, the board shall
106102 consult with institutions of higher education, the Texas Workforce
107103 Commission, members of the business community, and other relevant
108104 stakeholders.
109105 Sec. 61.810. EXPIRATION. This subchapter expires September
110106 1, 2025.
111107 SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2022, the Texas Higher
112108 Education Coordinating Board shall submit the board's initial
113109 report required under Section 61.808, Education Code, as added by
114110 this Act.
115111 SECTION 3. The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board is
116112 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
117113 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
118114 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
119115 purpose, the coordinating board may, but is not required to,
120116 implement a provision of this Act using other appropriations
121117 available for that purpose.
122118 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
123119 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
124120 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
125121 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
126122 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
127- * * * * *