Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR15 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/03/2021

                            S.C.R. No. 15


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The family and friends of Everette Wayne McBride of
 Mount Pleasant suffered an immeasurable loss with his death on
 February 8, 2019, at the age of 73; and
 WHEREAS, Born on October 25, 1945, in Dallas, "Skip" McBride
 was the son of Wayne McBride and the former Mae Deen Harris, and he
 grew up with the companionship of two siblings, Judith and Mike; he
 married Louise McBride, with whom he shared a rewarding union, and
 he took great pride in his children, Cynthia and Dennis, his
 stepchildren, Candace, Toy, Amanda, and Chelsea, and his
 grandchildren, Lauren, Dillon, Hayden, Brianna, Sofia, Paige, Mya,
 and Major; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. McBride graduated from Woodrow Wilson High
 School in Dallas, and in 1973, he attended the 30th Texas Game
 Warden Training Academy at Texas A&M University; he spent 35 years
 as a game warden captain in Northeast Texas, and he worked as a
 Realtor with Century 21 Landmark Associates beginning in 2005; in
 addition, he was a member of the Temple Masonic Lodge No. 70 in
 Mount Pleasant; and
 WHEREAS, Although Skip McBride is deeply missed, he has left
 his family and friends with a wealth of memories that they will
 forever treasure; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 87th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Everette Wayne McBride and extend
 sincere sympathy to the members of his family and to his friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Skip McBride.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 15 was adopted by the Senate
 on April 19, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 15 was adopted by the House
 on April 30, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor