Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR20 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 11, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 3, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 29, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021