06/07/2021 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/24/2021 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/24/2021 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | House passage reported | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Record vote RV#1295 | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/17/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 01/14/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/14/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |