Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR3 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 12, 2021
Analysis April 7, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2021
Bill April 8, 2021