05/08/2021 | Signed by the Governor | |||
04/29/2021 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 04/29/2021 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 04/28/2021 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | House passage reported | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Adopted | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 04/23/2021 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Considered in Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Printed in full | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Read & adopted | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |