Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR50 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill May 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 12, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021
Bill May 19, 2021