Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR47 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 2, 2021
Analysis May 11, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021