Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR47 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-S.J.R. No. 47
1+By: Huffman, et al. S.J.R. No. 47
2+ (Landgraf)
23
34
45 proposing a constitutional amendment changing the eligibility
56 requirements for certain judicial offices.
67 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
78 SECTION 1. Section 2(b), Article V, Texas Constitution, is
89 amended to read as follows:
910 (b) No person shall be eligible to serve in the office of
1011 Chief Justice or Justice of the Supreme Court unless the person:
1112 (1) is licensed to practice law in the State of Texas;
1213 (2) [this state and] is, at the time of election, a
1314 citizen of the United States and a resident of the State of Texas;
1415 (3) [this state, and] has attained the age of
1516 thirty-five years;
1617 (4) [, and] has been either:
1718 (A) a practicing lawyer licensed in the State of
1819 Texas for at least ten years;[,] or
1920 (B) a practicing lawyer licensed in the State of
2021 Texas and judge of a state court or county court established by the
2122 Legislature by statute for a combined total of [court of record
2223 together] at least ten years; and
2324 (5) during the time required by Subdivision (4) of
2425 this subsection has not had the person's license to practice law
2526 revoked, suspended, or subject to a probated suspension.
2627 SECTION 2. Section 7, Article V, Texas Constitution, is
2728 amended to read as follows:
2829 Sec. 7. (a) The State shall be divided into judicial
2930 districts, with each district having one or more Judges as may be
3031 provided by law or by this Constitution.
3132 (b) Each district judge shall be elected by the qualified
3233 voters at a General Election. To be eligible for appointment or
3334 election as a district judge, a person must:
3435 (1) [and shall] be a citizen of the United States and a
3536 resident of this State;
3637 (2) be[, who is] licensed to practice law in this
3738 State;
3839 (3) have [and has] been a practicing lawyer or a Judge
3940 of a Court in this State, or both combined, for eight [four (4)]
4041 years next preceding the judge's [his] election, during which time
4142 the judge's license to practice law has not been revoked,
4243 suspended, or subject to a probated suspension;
4344 (4) have [who has] resided in the district in which the
4445 judge [he] was elected for two [(2)] years next preceding the [his]
4546 election;[,] and
4647 (5) [who shall] reside in the [his] district during
4748 the judge's [his] term of office.
4849 (c) A district judge shall [and] hold the [his] office for
4950 the term [period] of four [(4)] years[,] and [who] shall receive for
5051 the judge's [his] services an annual salary to be fixed by the
5152 Legislature.
5253 (d) A District [The] Court shall conduct its proceedings at
5354 the county seat of the county in which the case is pending, except
5455 as otherwise provided by law. The Court [He] shall hold the regular
5556 terms [of his Court] at the County Seat of each County in the
5657 Court's [his] district in such manner as may be prescribed by law.
5758 The Legislature shall have power by General or Special Laws to make
5859 such provisions concerning the terms or sessions of each District
5960 Court as it may deem necessary.
6061 (e) The Legislature shall also provide for the holding of
6162 District Court when the Judge thereof is absent, or is from any
6263 cause disabled or disqualified from presiding.
6364 SECTION 3. The following temporary provision is added to
6465 the Texas Constitution:
6566 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
6667 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 87th Legislature,
6768 Regular Session, 2021, changing the eligibility requirements for a
6869 justice of the supreme court, a judge of the court of criminal
6970 appeals, a justice of a court of appeals, and a district judge.
7071 (b) The amendment to Section 2(b), Article V, of this
7172 constitution takes effect January 1, 2022, and applies only to a
7273 chief justice or other justice of the supreme court, a presiding
7374 judge or other judge of the court of criminal appeals, or a chief
7475 justice or other justice of a court of appeals who is first elected
7576 for a term that begins on or after January 1, 2025, or who is
7677 appointed on or after that date.
7778 (c) The amendment to Section 7, Article V, of this
7879 constitution takes effect January 1, 2022, and applies only to a
7980 district judge who is first elected for a term that begins on or
8081 after January 1, 2025, or who is appointed on or after that date.
8182 (d) This temporary provision expires January 1, 2026.
8283 SECTION 4. This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
8384 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 2, 2021.
8485 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
8586 proposition: "The constitutional amendment changing the
8687 eligibility requirements for a justice of the supreme court, a
8788 judge of the court of criminal appeals, a justice of a court of
8889 appeals, and a district judge."
89- ______________________________ ______________________________
90- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
91- I hereby certify that S.J.R. No. 47 was adopted by the Senate
92- on April 27, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
93- ______________________________
94- Secretary of the Senate
95- I hereby certify that S.J.R. No. 47 was adopted by the House
96- on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 120, Nays 19, one
97- present not voting.
98- ______________________________
99- Chief Clerk of the House
100- Received:
101- ______________________________
102- Date
103- ______________________________
104- Secretary of State