Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR51 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/20/2021

                            By: Creighton, Bettencourt S.J.R. No. 51
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2021; March 18, 2021, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 20, 2021, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 2, one present not voting; April 20, 2021, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment prohibiting the unsolicited
 distribution of an application form for an absentee ballot.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2, Article VI, Texas Constitution, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  An officer or employee of this state or of a political
 subdivision of this state may not distribute an official
 application form for an absentee ballot to a person unless the
 person has requested the distribution.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 2, 2021.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition:  "The constitutional amendment prohibiting the
 unsolicited distribution of an application form for an absentee
 ballot."
 * * * * *