Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR12 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 01/27/2021

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 12
 In Memory
 of
 Jacquelyn Ann Wofford Wetegrove
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Jacquelyn Ann Wofford Wetegrove, who
 died October 29, 2020, at the age of 67; and
 WHEREAS, Jackie Wetegrove was an exemplary citizen who was
 widely admired for her contributions to her community and her
 loving nature; and
 WHEREAS, She was born on October 22, 1953, in Seguin, and
 she attended Raymondville High School; she married Joseph
 Wetegrove on October 20, 1973, and they enjoyed 47 years of
 marriage together; they were blessed with three daughters,
 Jennifer Marie Wiehrdt, Jessica Ann Ulary, and Janelle Eleanor
 Fitch; and
 WHEREAS, Jackie was known affectionately to many as "Mama
 Jack," and she took great pleasure in her role as a homemaker and
 in pampering her daughters and six grandchildren; she enjoyed
 dancing, listening to music, and taking long walks; and
 WHEREAS, A woman of kindness, honesty, and patience, she
 gave unselfishly to others, and her love of family and friends
 and her enthusiasm for living each day to the fullest will not be
 forgotten by those who were privileged to share in her life; and
 WHEREAS, She was a devoted wife, mother, and grandmother,
 and she leaves behind memories that will be cherished forever by
 her many loved ones; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Jacquelyn Ann Wetegrove; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 her family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Jackie Wetegrove.
 Lucio
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on January 26, 2021, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate