Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR13 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 01/27/2021

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 13
 In Memory
 of
 Duke Matthews Covert
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Duke Matthews Covert, an esteemed member
 of the Austin community, who died December 22, 2020, at the age of
 74; and
 WHEREAS, Duke Covert was born on August 15, 1946; he grew
 up in Austin and graduated from Stephen F. Austin High School,
 where he was a standout athlete; he attended Texas Christian
 University on a football scholarship before transferring to The
 University of Texas at Austin, where he was a member of Phi Gamma
 Delta fraternity and earned a degree in finance; and
 WHEREAS, Duke married Lynne Shapiro on February 1, 1969, and
 they were blessed with more than five decades together; they were
 also blessed with three daughters, Courtney Covert Elliott, Kacy
 Covert Tolleson, and Kimberley Covert Robinson, and with 10
 grandchildren, who were a source of much pride and joy for him; and
 WHEREAS, As a youth, Mr. Covert spent time during summers
 and weekends helping his father in the family's automobile
 dealership, which was established by his great-grandfather in
 1909; he joined the business full-time as an adult, and he worked
 alongside his brothers Danay and Rox to expand the business and
 to make it one of the largest family-owned dealerships in the
 state; and
 WHEREAS, A devoted Christian who was guided by his faith in
 his daily life, Duke was a lifelong member of the Episcopal
 Church of the Good Shepherd; he was grateful for the many rewards
 he had been blessed with, and he took great pleasure in sharing
 those gifts by providing opportunities for others and by serving
 as a mentor to many young people; and
 WHEREAS, A man of courage, wisdom, and generosity, he gave
 unselfishly to others, and his enthusiasm for living each day to
 the fullest will long be a source of inspiration to those who were
 privileged to share in his life; and
 WHEREAS, He was a loving husband, father, and grandfather,
 and he leaves behind memories that will be cherished forever by
 his family and countless friends; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Duke Matthews Covert; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Duke Covert.
 Eckhardt
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on January 26, 2021, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate