Texas 2021 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR174 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/22/2021

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 174
 In Memory
 of
 John Gooch
 WHEREAS, John Addison Gooch of Marshall passed away on
 February 3, 2021, at the age of 101, drawing to a close a long
 life enriched by family, friends, and meaningful service to his
 country; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Marshall on November 4, 1919, to Eli and
 Lillian Fair Epps Gooch, John Gooch grew up with the
 companionship of four sisters, Essie Mae, Ruby, Bessie, and
 Earlene; he was only seven years old when his father passed away,
 and in order to help support the family, he left school after the
 sixth grade to work his family's land; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Gooch was drafted into the United States Army
 on September 5, 1942; assigned to the 811th Engineer Battalion,
 an all-Black engineering unit, he was deployed to U.S.-occupied
 islands in the Pacific, where he was tasked with transporting
 base construction materials; while in the military, he was
 awarded an Atlantic Pacific Campaign Medal with one bronze star
 and a Good Conduct Medal, along with a Victory Ribbon, one
 Service Stripe, and four Overseas Service Bars; he was honorably
 discharged on November 22, 1945, at the rank of private first
 class; and
 WHEREAS, After returning stateside, Mr. Gooch worked at
 the Marshall Brickyard until his retirement; he was beloved by
 his fellow congregants at Greater Macedonia Baptist Church and by
 his brothers at St. James Masonic Lodge No. 0112, where he had
 been a member for over 70 years, and he was celebrated by his
 community as a Hometown Hero on Veterans Day 2019; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Gooch married his true love, the former
 Mollie Mae Beal, on August 20, 1946; the couple raised three
 children, Bernard, Judy, and Aretta, of whom he was deeply proud,
 and he later welcomed into his family four grandchildren, Rodney,
 Charita, Bernard, and the late Deon Jon Adams, as well as three
 great-grandchildren, Vaneisha, Bernard, and Niya; a kind and
 loving father and grandfather, he was also cherished by his
 nieces and nephews, and he enjoyed sharing stories of his earlier
 days and his time in the army with the younger generations; and
 WHEREAS, John Gooch was a source of great inspiration to
 all who were fortunate enough to know him, and he will forever be
 remembered with deep affection and admiration; now, therefore,
 be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of John Addison Gooch
 and extend heartfelt sympathy to all those who mourn his passing;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of John Addison Gooch.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 22, 2021, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate