1 | 1 | | SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 174 |
---|
2 | 2 | | In Memory |
---|
3 | 3 | | of |
---|
4 | 4 | | John Gooch |
---|
5 | 5 | | WHEREAS, John Addison Gooch of Marshall passed away on |
---|
6 | 6 | | February 3, 2021, at the age of 101, drawing to a close a long |
---|
7 | 7 | | life enriched by family, friends, and meaningful service to his |
---|
8 | 8 | | country; and |
---|
9 | 9 | | WHEREAS, Born in Marshall on November 4, 1919, to Eli and |
---|
10 | 10 | | Lillian Fair Epps Gooch, John Gooch grew up with the |
---|
11 | 11 | | companionship of four sisters, Essie Mae, Ruby, Bessie, and |
---|
12 | 12 | | Earlene; he was only seven years old when his father passed away, |
---|
13 | 13 | | and in order to help support the family, he left school after the |
---|
14 | 14 | | sixth grade to work his family's land; and |
---|
15 | 15 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Gooch was drafted into the United States Army |
---|
16 | 16 | | on September 5, 1942; assigned to the 811th Engineer Battalion, |
---|
17 | 17 | | an all-Black engineering unit, he was deployed to U.S.-occupied |
---|
18 | 18 | | islands in the Pacific, where he was tasked with transporting |
---|
19 | 19 | | base construction materials; while in the military, he was |
---|
20 | 20 | | awarded an Atlantic Pacific Campaign Medal with one bronze star |
---|
21 | 21 | | and a Good Conduct Medal, along with a Victory Ribbon, one |
---|
22 | 22 | | Service Stripe, and four Overseas Service Bars; he was honorably |
---|
23 | 23 | | discharged on November 22, 1945, at the rank of private first |
---|
24 | 24 | | class; and |
---|
25 | 25 | | WHEREAS, After returning stateside, Mr. Gooch worked at |
---|
26 | 26 | | the Marshall Brickyard until his retirement; he was beloved by |
---|
27 | 27 | | his fellow congregants at Greater Macedonia Baptist Church and by |
---|
28 | 28 | | his brothers at St. James Masonic Lodge No. 0112, where he had |
---|
29 | 29 | | been a member for over 70 years, and he was celebrated by his |
---|
30 | 30 | | community as a Hometown Hero on Veterans Day 2019; and |
---|
31 | 31 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Gooch married his true love, the former |
---|
32 | 32 | | Mollie Mae Beal, on August 20, 1946; the couple raised three |
---|
33 | 33 | | children, Bernard, Judy, and Aretta, of whom he was deeply proud, |
---|
34 | 34 | | and he later welcomed into his family four grandchildren, Rodney, |
---|
35 | 35 | | Charita, Bernard, and the late Deon Jon Adams, as well as three |
---|
36 | 36 | | great-grandchildren, Vaneisha, Bernard, and Niya; a kind and |
---|
37 | 37 | | loving father and grandfather, he was also cherished by his |
---|
38 | 38 | | nieces and nephews, and he enjoyed sharing stories of his earlier |
---|
39 | 39 | | days and his time in the army with the younger generations; and |
---|
40 | 40 | | WHEREAS, John Gooch was a source of great inspiration to |
---|
41 | 41 | | all who were fortunate enough to know him, and he will forever be |
---|
42 | 42 | | remembered with deep affection and admiration; now, therefore, |
---|
43 | 43 | | be it |
---|
44 | 44 | | RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th |
---|
45 | 45 | | Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of John Addison Gooch |
---|
46 | 46 | | and extend heartfelt sympathy to all those who mourn his passing; |
---|
47 | 47 | | and, be it further |
---|
48 | 48 | | RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be |
---|
49 | 49 | | prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns |
---|
50 | 50 | | this day, it do so in memory of John Addison Gooch. |
---|
51 | 51 | | Hughes |
---|
52 | 52 | | ________________________________ |
---|
53 | 53 | | President of the Senate |
---|
54 | 54 | | I hereby certify that the |
---|
55 | 55 | | above Resolution was adopted by |
---|
56 | 56 | | the Senate on March 22, 2021, by a |
---|
57 | 57 | | rising vote. |
---|
58 | 58 | | ________________________________ |
---|
59 | 59 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
60 | 60 | | ________________________________ |
---|
61 | 61 | | Member, Texas Senate |
---|