SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 174 In Memory of John Gooch WHEREAS, John Addison Gooch of Marshall passed away on February 3, 2021, at the age of 101, drawing to a close a long life enriched by family, friends, and meaningful service to his country; and WHEREAS, Born in Marshall on November 4, 1919, to Eli and Lillian Fair Epps Gooch, John Gooch grew up with the companionship of four sisters, Essie Mae, Ruby, Bessie, and Earlene; he was only seven years old when his father passed away, and in order to help support the family, he left school after the sixth grade to work his family's land; and WHEREAS, Mr. Gooch was drafted into the United States Army on September 5, 1942; assigned to the 811th Engineer Battalion, an all-Black engineering unit, he was deployed to U.S.-occupied islands in the Pacific, where he was tasked with transporting base construction materials; while in the military, he was awarded an Atlantic Pacific Campaign Medal with one bronze star and a Good Conduct Medal, along with a Victory Ribbon, one Service Stripe, and four Overseas Service Bars; he was honorably discharged on November 22, 1945, at the rank of private first class; and WHEREAS, After returning stateside, Mr. Gooch worked at the Marshall Brickyard until his retirement; he was beloved by his fellow congregants at Greater Macedonia Baptist Church and by his brothers at St. James Masonic Lodge No. 0112, where he had been a member for over 70 years, and he was celebrated by his community as a Hometown Hero on Veterans Day 2019; and WHEREAS, Mr. Gooch married his true love, the former Mollie Mae Beal, on August 20, 1946; the couple raised three children, Bernard, Judy, and Aretta, of whom he was deeply proud, and he later welcomed into his family four grandchildren, Rodney, Charita, Bernard, and the late Deon Jon Adams, as well as three great-grandchildren, Vaneisha, Bernard, and Niya; a kind and loving father and grandfather, he was also cherished by his nieces and nephews, and he enjoyed sharing stories of his earlier days and his time in the army with the younger generations; and WHEREAS, John Gooch was a source of great inspiration to all who were fortunate enough to know him, and he will forever be remembered with deep affection and admiration; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of John Addison Gooch and extend heartfelt sympathy to all those who mourn his passing; and, be it further RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns this day, it do so in memory of John Addison Gooch. Hughes ________________________________ President of the Senate I hereby certify that the above Resolution was adopted by the Senate on March 22, 2021, by a rising vote. ________________________________ Secretary of the Senate ________________________________ Member, Texas Senate