Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR225 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/08/2021

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 225
 In Memory
 of
 Chad Michael Walker
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Trooper Chad Michael Walker, who died on
 March 31, 2021, at the age of 38 as a result of injuries sustained
 while serving in the line of duty; and
 WHEREAS, An exemplary trooper with the Texas Department of
 Public Safety, Chad Walker served the citizens of Texas with
 courage, integrity, and a commitment to upholding the highest
 standards of law enforcement duty; he was highly respected and
 admired by his colleagues and by the members of his community; and
 WHEREAS, Chad was born on May 21, 1982, in Corsicana to
 Michael and Brenda Walker; he grew up in Groesbeck and was an avid
 outdoorsman who enjoyed hunting and fishing and helping his
 grandfather with cattle; he graduated from Groesbeck High School
 in 2000; and
 WHEREAS, Chad began his career in law enforcement in 2003
 as a member of the Athens Police Department, and he later served
 with the Groesbeck Police Department and the Limestone County
 Sheriff's Office; he joined the Texas Department of Public Safety
 in 2015 and was stationed in Groesbeck; and
 WHEREAS, He married Tobie Taylor Walker, his beloved wife,
 on September 22, 2018, and they were blessed with a baby daughter
 this year, Tulsa June; Chad was also blessed with a son, Ethan,
 and with twin daughters, Rylee and Charlee, who were a source of
 much pride and joy for him; and
 WHEREAS, Chad was active in his community and was on the
 Limestone County Farm Bureau Board of Directors; he was a devout
 Christian who was guided by his faith in his daily life, and he
 was noted for his strength of character, his generosity, and his
 ever-present readiness to help those in need; and
 WHEREAS, Chad's dedication to public service was an
 inspiration to others, and his courageous spirit and his
 enthusiasm for living each day to the fullest will not be
 forgotten by those who were privileged to share in his life; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Chad Michael Walker; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Trooper Chad Walker.
 Schwertner
 Alvarado Hancock Nichols Alvarado Hancock Nichols
Alvarado Hancock Nichols
 Bettencourt Hinojosa Paxton Bettencourt Hinojosa Paxton
Bettencourt Hinojosa Paxton
 Birdwell Huffman Perry Birdwell Huffman Perry
Birdwell Huffman Perry
 Blanco Hughes Powell Blanco Hughes Powell
Blanco Hughes Powell
 Buckingham Johnson Seliger Buckingham Johnson Seliger
Buckingham Johnson Seliger
 Campbell Kolkhorst Springer Campbell Kolkhorst Springer
Campbell Kolkhorst Springer
 Creighton Lucio Taylor Creighton Lucio Taylor
Creighton Lucio Taylor
 Eckhardt Menéndez West Eckhardt Menéndez West
Eckhardt Menéndez West
 Gutierrez Miles Whitmire Gutierrez Miles Whitmire
Gutierrez Miles Whitmire
 Hall Nelson Zaffirini Hall Nelson Zaffirini
Hall Nelson Zaffirini
 Patrick, President of the Senate
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on April 8, 2021, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate

Alvarado Hancock Nichols

Bettencourt Hinojosa Paxton

Birdwell Huffman Perry

Blanco Hughes Powell

Buckingham Johnson Seliger

Campbell Kolkhorst Springer

Creighton Lucio Taylor

Eckhardt Menéndez West

Gutierrez Miles Whitmire

Hall Nelson Zaffirini