Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR257 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/14/2021

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 257
 In Memory
 of
 James Nolan Dunlap Jr.
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of James Nolan Dunlap Jr., an esteemed
 member of the Jack County community, who died January 3, 2020, at
 the age of 77; and
 WHEREAS, A Jack County native, Nolan Dunlap was born to James
 and Eva Marie Dunlap on March 5, 1942; he grew up with four
 siblings, and he graduated from Jacksboro High School in 1961; and
 WHEREAS, On February 23, 1963, Nolan married Amelia Irene
 "Lee" Cain, and they shared a rewarding marriage of 56 years; the
 couple became the proud parents of two daughters, Staci and
 Holly, and they were further blessed with six grandchildren,
 Kortland, Kyler, Paxton, Logan, London, and Larson; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Dunlap worked in the oil field business for
 many years before his election as Jack County justice of the
 peace; he served his fellow residents with distinction in that
 position for nearly three decades until his retirement; he also
 served his community as a member of the local chamber of commerce
 and the Lions Club, and he was a valued congregant of Live Oak
 Baptist Church; in his leisure time, he enjoyed fishing, hunting,
 and searching for arrowheads; and
 WHEREAS, Nolan Dunlap was known for his integrity and
 strength and for his devotion to his family and friends and Jack
 County, and he leaves behind memories that will be treasured by
 many for years to come; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Nolan Dunlap Jr.; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Nolan Dunlap Jr.
 Springer
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on April 14, 2021, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate