Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR432 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/19/2021

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 432
 In Memory
 of
 Robert Otto Dittmar II
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of Dr. Robert Otto Dittmar II, who died
 August 8, 2020, at the age of 64; and
 WHEREAS, Bob Dittmar was born on October 18, 1955, in
 Fredericksburg; a fifth-generation Texas rancher, he learned the
 value of hard work and the importance of land preservation at a
 young age; he followed in his father's footsteps and attended
 Texas A&M University, where he earned a degree in veterinary
 medicine and was a member of the Aggies' national championship
 wool-judging team; and
 WHEREAS, He married Bernadine, his beloved wife of 41
 years, on August 18, 1979, and the couple was blessed with two
 children, Robert Otto Dittmar III and Whitney Hild; his
 grandchildren, Hayden, Paige, Kimber, and Levi, were a source of
 much pride and joy for him; and
 WHEREAS, He worked for a time in Weslaco and Hondo before
 moving his veterinary practice to Kerrville so that he could also
 work on his family's ranch; he became known for building close
 relationships with his clients and for his willingness to serve
 them at a moment's notice; and
 WHEREAS, In 2014, he was named the first state wildlife
 veterinarian for the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department, which
 allowed him to follow his passion for natural resource
 conservation; he was particularly drawn to Texas bighorn sheep
 and pronghorn antelope relocation efforts; and
 WHEREAS, He held leadership positions in a wide range of
 professional and community organizations, including the Doss and
 Harper Wildlife Management Associations, the Texas Farm Bureau,
 the Texas Wildlife Association, the Buckskin Brigades, and the
 Learning Across New Dimensions in Science program; he was an
 active member of Zion Lutheran Church; and
 WHEREAS, A man of courage, generosity, and wisdom, he gave
 unselfishly to others, and his passion for his work and his
 enthusiasm for living each day to the fullest will not be
 forgotten by those who were privileged to share in his life; and
 WHEREAS, He was a devoted husband, father, and
 grandfather, and he leaves behind memories that will be treasured
 forever by his family and many friends; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th
 Legislature, hereby extend sincere condolences to the bereaved
 family of Dr. Robert Otto Dittmar II; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of Dr. Robert Otto Dittmar II.
 Buckingham, Perry
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 18, 2021, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate