Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR441 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/24/2021

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 441
 In Memory
 of
 Mike Baughman
 WHEREAS, Memories of a life filled with joyful times and
 meaningful accomplishments remain to comfort the family and
 friends of Mike Baughman of Henderson, who passed away on
 November 23, 2020, at the age of 70; and
 WHEREAS, A native of Henderson, Mike Baughman was born on
 July 13, 1950, to A. E. and Jane Watson Baughman, and he grew up
 with the companionship of two siblings, Jimmy and Patricia; he
 graduated from Henderson High School in 1968, and he went on to
 attend Kilgore College and The University of Texas at Austin,
 before earning his bachelor's degree from Stephen F. Austin State
 University; along the way, he served his country as a member of
 the United States Air Force Reserve; and
 WHEREAS, After graduating from the Dallas Institute of
 Funeral Service, Mr. Baughman began his career with Bryan
 Funeral Home; he went on to run his own business, Baughman
 Monument Company, in addition to working for the Rader Funeral
 Home in Henderson and Hawthorn Funeral Home in Carthage; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Baughman married the love of his life, the
 former Beverly June Waller, on June 27, 1998; the couple enjoyed
 raising Jack Russell terriers, and together, they were active
 members of Calvary Baptist Church, where Mr. Baughman sang in the
 choir and served as a youth director alongside his wife; he was
 also a pilot who had flown from the Rusk County Airport since
 1980; and
 WHEREAS, Passionate about high school football,
 Mr. Baughman was the well-known "voice of the Lions" for his alma
 mater for more than four decades; he served as the play-by-play
 broadcaster for Lions games and even called the state
 championship match from Cowboys Stadium in 2010; over the years,
 he developed an extensive knowledge of Henderson High School
 football statistics; and
 WHEREAS, Although Mike Baughman is deeply missed by all
 those who cherished him, they will forever remember his profound
 commitment to his family, his faith, and his community; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of Mike Baughman and
 extend heartfelt sympathy to the members of his family: to his
 wife, Beverly Waller Baughman; to his brother, Jimmy Baughman,
 and sister, Patricia Spraker; to his nieces and nephews; and to
 his other relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Mike Baughman.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 19, 2021, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate