Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR530 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/29/2021

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 530
 In Memory
 of
 Anna Calhoun and Harper Provenza
 WHEREAS, Words cannot adequately express the sorrow felt
 by the loving family of 23-year-old Anna Lee Calhoun and her
 two-year-old daughter, Harper Marie Provenza, who passed away on
 May 4, 2021; and
 WHEREAS, Anna Lee Calhoun was born in Tuscaloosa, Alabama,
 on September 17, 1997, to Donna McNatt and Ronnie Calhoun; she
 was a standout member of the volleyball team at Holy Spirit
 Catholic High School in Tuscaloosa, Alabama, and after
 graduating, she enrolled as a biology major at Midwestern State
 University in Wichita Falls, where she excelled in her studies; and
 WHEREAS, Ms. Calhoun shared an inseparable bond with her
 beloved daughter, Harper, who was born on July 6, 2018; just like
 her mother, Harper exuded joy and happiness, and her bright smile
 and abundant laughter made her the center of attention everywhere
 she went; and
 WHEREAS, Ms. Calhoun's life was further blessed by the
 companionship of a close-knit group of friends, with whom she
 made many wonderful memories, and she especially treasured the
 special connection she shared with her best friend, Jason
 Gribble; and
 WHEREAS, Although the loss of this beloved mother and child
 brings tremendous sadness, Anna Calhoun and Harper Provenza
 enriched the lives of everyone around them in ways beyond measure,
 and they will forever hold a cherished place in the hearts of the
 many people who held them dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Anna Lee Calhoun
 and Harper Marie Provenza and extend deepest condolences to the
 members of their family: to Ms. Calhoun's mother, Donna McNatt,
 her stepmother, Cheryl Calhoun, her grandmother, Mimi, and her
 aunts, uncles, cousins, and extended family in Alabama; to
 Harper's other grandmother, Becky Provenza, her
 great-grandmother, Lois Whitaker, and her numerous aunts,
 uncles, and cousins; and to all those who mourn their passing;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Anna Lee Calhoun and Harper Marie
 Provenza.
 Springer
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 28, 2021, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate