1 | 1 | | By: Buckingham S.R. No. 558 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | SENATE RESOLUTION |
---|
5 | 5 | | BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th |
---|
6 | 6 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 2021, That Senate Rule 12.03 be |
---|
7 | 7 | | suspended in part as provided by Senate Rule 12.08 to enable the |
---|
8 | 8 | | conference committee appointed to resolve the differences on |
---|
9 | 9 | | Senate Bill 713 (the sunset review process and certain |
---|
10 | 10 | | governmental entities subject to that process) to consider and |
---|
11 | 11 | | take action on the following matters: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (1) Senate Rule 12.03(4) is suspended to permit the |
---|
13 | 13 | | committee to add text on matters not included in either the house |
---|
14 | 14 | | or senate version of the bill by adding the following new |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTIONS to the bill: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1.03. ANATOMICAL BOARD OF THE STATE OF TEXAS. |
---|
17 | 17 | | Section 691.003, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as |
---|
18 | 18 | | follows: |
---|
19 | 19 | | Sec. 691.003. SUNSET PROVISION. The Anatomical Board of |
---|
20 | 20 | | the State of Texas is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code |
---|
21 | 21 | | (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided by |
---|
22 | 22 | | that chapter, the board is abolished September 1, 2023 [2021]. |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 1.04. TEXAS COMMISSION OF LICENSING AND |
---|
24 | 24 | | REGULATION; TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF LICENSING AND REGULATION. |
---|
25 | 25 | | Section 51.002(a), Occupations Code, is amended to read as |
---|
26 | 26 | | follows: |
---|
27 | 27 | | (a) The Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation and |
---|
28 | 28 | | the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation are subject to |
---|
29 | 29 | | Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless |
---|
30 | 30 | | continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the |
---|
31 | 31 | | commission and the department are abolished September 1, 2023 |
---|
32 | 32 | | [2021]. |
---|
33 | 33 | | SECTION 1.05. TEXAS COMMISSION ON LAW ENFORCEMENT. (a) |
---|
34 | 34 | | Section 1701.002, Occupations Code, is amended to read as |
---|
35 | 35 | | follows: |
---|
36 | 36 | | Sec. 1701.002. APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The Texas |
---|
37 | 37 | | Commission on Law Enforcement is subject to Chapter 325, |
---|
38 | 38 | | Government Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in |
---|
39 | 39 | | existence as provided by that chapter, the commission is |
---|
40 | 40 | | abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2023 [2021]. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (b) For purposes of Section 1701.002, Occupations Code, |
---|
42 | 42 | | as amended by this Act, the Sunset Advisory Commission shall |
---|
43 | 43 | | conduct a limited-scope review of the Texas Commission on Law |
---|
44 | 44 | | Enforcement for the 88th Legislature. |
---|
45 | 45 | | (c) In conducting the limited-scope review under this |
---|
46 | 46 | | section, the Sunset Advisory Commission staff evaluation and |
---|
47 | 47 | | report must be limited to reviewing the appropriateness of the |
---|
48 | 48 | | Sunset Advisory Commission's recommendations for the Texas |
---|
49 | 49 | | Commission on Law Enforcement made to the 87th Legislature. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (d) The Sunset Advisory Commission's recommendations to |
---|
51 | 51 | | the 88th Legislature may include any recommendations the |
---|
52 | 52 | | commission considers appropriate based on the limited-scope |
---|
53 | 53 | | review conducted under this section. |
---|
54 | 54 | | SECTION 3.04. TEXAS RACING COMMISSION. (a) Section |
---|
55 | 55 | | 2021.008(a), Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
56 | 56 | | (a) The commission is subject to Chapter 325, Government |
---|
57 | 57 | | Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as |
---|
58 | 58 | | provided by that chapter, and except as provided by Subsections |
---|
59 | 59 | | (b) and (c), the commission is abolished and this subtitle |
---|
60 | 60 | | expires September 1, 2027 [2021]. |
---|
61 | 61 | | (b) Not later than December 1, 2021, the Texas Racing |
---|
62 | 62 | | Commission shall replace all employees who were employed by the |
---|
63 | 63 | | Texas Racing Commission on August 31, 2021, in: |
---|
64 | 64 | | (1) an exempt position; or |
---|
65 | 65 | | (2) a position at or above salary group B27 in the |
---|
66 | 66 | | Texas Position Classification Plan, 1961. |
---|
67 | 67 | | (c) The Texas Racing Commission may not hire or rehire an |
---|
68 | 68 | | individual to fill a position described by Subsection (b) of this |
---|
69 | 69 | | section if the individual was employed by the commission in a |
---|
70 | 70 | | position described by Subsection (b) of this section during the |
---|
71 | 71 | | six months preceding the effective date of this Act. |
---|
72 | 72 | | Explanation: This addition is necessary to limit the |
---|
73 | 73 | | scope of the next sunset review of the Texas Commission on Law |
---|
74 | 74 | | Enforcement, to replace certain employees of the Texas Racing |
---|
75 | 75 | | Commission, and to change the sunset review date various state |
---|
76 | 76 | | agencies. |
---|
77 | 77 | | (2) Senate Rule 12.03(4) is suspended to permit the |
---|
78 | 78 | | committee to add text on a matter not included in either the house |
---|
79 | 79 | | or senate version of the bill by adding the following new SECTION |
---|
80 | 80 | | to the bill: |
---|
81 | 81 | | ARTICLE 9. TRANSITION |
---|
82 | 82 | | SECTION 9.01. CONFLICT WITH OTHER LAWS. If a conflict |
---|
83 | 83 | | exists between this Act and another Act of the 87th Legislature, |
---|
84 | 84 | | Regular Session, 2021, that amends or repeals the sunset date of |
---|
85 | 85 | | the governmental entity, the provisions of the other Act control |
---|
86 | 86 | | without regard to the relative dates of enactment. |
---|
87 | 87 | | Explanation: This addition is necessary to address any |
---|
88 | 88 | | conflicts with other legislation enacted by the 87th |
---|
89 | 89 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 2021. |
---|
90 | 90 | | _______________________________ |
---|
91 | 91 | | President of the Senate |
---|
92 | 92 | | I hereby certify that the |
---|
93 | 93 | | above Resolution was adopted by |
---|
94 | 94 | | the Senate on May 30, 2021, by the |
---|
95 | 95 | | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
96 | 96 | | _______________________________ |
---|
97 | 97 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|