Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR558 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            By: Buckingham S.R. No. 558


 SENATE RESOLUTION
 BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2021, That Senate Rule 12.03 be
 suspended in part as provided by Senate Rule 12.08 to enable the
 conference committee appointed to resolve the differences on
 Senate Bill 713 (the sunset review process and certain
 governmental entities subject to that process) to consider and
 take action on the following matters:
 (1)  Senate Rule 12.03(4) is suspended to permit the
 committee to add text on matters not included in either the house
 or senate version of the bill by adding the following new
 SECTIONS to the bill:
 SECTION 1.03. ANATOMICAL BOARD OF THE STATE OF TEXAS.
 Section 691.003, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 691.003. SUNSET PROVISION.  The Anatomical Board of
 the State of Texas is subject to Chapter 325, Government Code
 (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as provided by
 that chapter, the board is abolished September 1, 2023 [2021].
 SECTION 1.04.  TEXAS COMMISSION OF LICENSING AND
 REGULATION; TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF LICENSING AND REGULATION.
 Section 51.002(a), Occupations Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The Texas Commission of Licensing and Regulation and
 the Texas Department of Licensing and Regulation are subject to
 Chapter 325, Government Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless
 continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the
 commission and the department are abolished September 1, 2023
 [2021].
 SECTION 1.05.  TEXAS COMMISSION ON LAW ENFORCEMENT.  (a)
 Section 1701.002, Occupations Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 1701.002.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT.  The Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement is subject to Chapter 325,
 Government Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in
 existence as provided by that chapter, the commission is
 abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2023 [2021].
 (b)  For purposes of Section 1701.002, Occupations Code,
 as amended by this Act, the Sunset Advisory Commission shall
 conduct a limited-scope review of the Texas Commission on Law
 Enforcement for the 88th Legislature.
 (c)  In conducting the limited-scope review under this
 section, the Sunset Advisory Commission staff evaluation and
 report must be limited to reviewing the appropriateness of the
 Sunset Advisory Commission's recommendations for the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement made to the 87th Legislature.
 (d)  The Sunset Advisory Commission's recommendations to
 the 88th Legislature may include any recommendations the
 commission considers appropriate based on the limited-scope
 review conducted under this section.
 SECTION 3.04.  TEXAS RACING COMMISSION.  (a)  Section
 2021.008(a), Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission is subject to Chapter 325, Government
 Code (Texas Sunset Act).  Unless continued in existence as
 provided by that chapter, and except as provided by Subsections
 (b) and (c), the commission is abolished and this subtitle
 expires September 1, 2027 [2021].
 (b)  Not later than December 1, 2021, the Texas Racing
 Commission shall replace all employees who were employed by the
 Texas Racing Commission on August 31, 2021, in:
 (1)  an exempt position; or
 (2)  a position at or above salary group B27 in the
 Texas Position Classification Plan, 1961.
 (c)  The Texas Racing Commission may not hire or rehire an
 individual to fill a position described by Subsection (b) of this
 section if the individual was employed by the commission in a
 position described by Subsection (b) of this section during the
 six months preceding the effective date of this Act.
 Explanation:  This addition is necessary to limit the
 scope of the next sunset review of the Texas Commission on Law
 Enforcement, to replace certain employees of the Texas Racing
 Commission, and to change the sunset review date various state
 agencies.
 (2)  Senate Rule 12.03(4) is suspended to permit the
 committee to add text on a matter not included in either the house
 or senate version of the bill by adding the following new SECTION
 to the bill:
 ARTICLE 9.  TRANSITION
 SECTION 9.01.  CONFLICT WITH OTHER LAWS.  If a conflict
 exists between this Act and another Act of the 87th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2021, that amends or repeals the sunset date of
 the governmental entity, the provisions of the other Act control
 without regard to the relative dates of enactment.
 Explanation:  This addition is necessary to address any
 conflicts with other legislation enacted by the 87th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2021.
  _______________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 30, 2021, by the
 following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
  _______________________________
  Secretary of the Senate