Senate
|
07/16/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA12 Zaffirini
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA11 Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA10 Campbell
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA9 Zaffirini
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA8 Bettencourt
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA7 Zaffirini
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA6 Zaffirini
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA5 Zaffirini
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Birdwell
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Hughes
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Hughes
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|