1 | 1 | | 87S20441 TSS-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Hunter H.B. No. 15 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to dates of certain elections to be held in 2022. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 41, Election Code, is |
---|
10 | 10 | | amended by adding Section 41.0075 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 41.0075. PRIMARY ELECTION: TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) |
---|
12 | 12 | | This section supersedes any conflicting statute with respect to a |
---|
13 | 13 | | primary election to be held in 2022. |
---|
14 | 14 | | (b) For the purposes of this section, a redistricting plan |
---|
15 | 15 | | "becomes law" on the earlier of: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (1) the date the governor signs an Act of the 87th |
---|
17 | 17 | | Legislature relating to the composition of the State Board of |
---|
18 | 18 | | Education, state legislative, or federal congressional districts; |
---|
19 | 19 | | or |
---|
20 | 20 | | (2) the date on which the time for gubernatorial |
---|
21 | 21 | | action on an Act of the 87th Legislature relating to the composition |
---|
22 | 22 | | of the State Board of Education, state legislative, or federal |
---|
23 | 23 | | congressional districts expires under Section 14, Article IV, Texas |
---|
24 | 24 | | Constitution. |
---|
25 | 25 | | (c) If a redistricting plan adopted following the 2020 |
---|
26 | 26 | | federal census by the 87th Legislature that includes a State Board |
---|
27 | 27 | | of Education, state legislative, or federal congressional district |
---|
28 | 28 | | becomes law: |
---|
29 | 29 | | (1) on or before November 22, 2021, the following |
---|
30 | 30 | | dates related to the primary election for the election of officers |
---|
31 | 31 | | for the district shall apply: |
---|
32 | 32 | | (A) an application for a place on the general |
---|
33 | 33 | | primary election ballot must be filed not earlier than November 29, |
---|
34 | 34 | | 2021, and not later than 6 p.m. on December 13, 2021; |
---|
35 | 35 | | (B) the general primary election date is March 1, |
---|
36 | 36 | | 2022; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | (C) the runoff primary election date is May 24, |
---|
38 | 38 | | 2022; |
---|
39 | 39 | | (2) after November 22, 2021, and on or before January |
---|
40 | 40 | | 3, 2022, the following dates related to the primary election for the |
---|
41 | 41 | | election of officers for the district shall apply: |
---|
42 | 42 | | (A) an application for a place on the general |
---|
43 | 43 | | primary election ballot must be filed not earlier than January 10, |
---|
44 | 44 | | 2022, and not later than 6 p.m. on January 24, 2022; |
---|
45 | 45 | | (B) the general primary election date is April 5, |
---|
46 | 46 | | 2022; and |
---|
47 | 47 | | (C) the runoff primary election date is June 21, |
---|
48 | 48 | | 2022; and |
---|
49 | 49 | | (3) after January 3, 2022, and on or before February |
---|
50 | 50 | | 14, 2022, the following dates related to the primary election for |
---|
51 | 51 | | the election of officers for the district shall apply: |
---|
52 | 52 | | (A) an application for a place on the general |
---|
53 | 53 | | primary election ballot must be filed not earlier than February 21, |
---|
54 | 54 | | 2022, and not later than 6 p.m. on March 7, 2022; |
---|
55 | 55 | | (B) the general primary election date is May 24, |
---|
56 | 56 | | 2022; and |
---|
57 | 57 | | (C) the runoff primary election date is July 26, |
---|
58 | 58 | | 2022. |
---|
59 | 59 | | (d) If a plan for a State Board of Education, state |
---|
60 | 60 | | legislative, or federal congressional district becomes law on dates |
---|
61 | 61 | | included under more than one subdivision of Subsection (c), the |
---|
62 | 62 | | latest dates provided for the filing period and the general and |
---|
63 | 63 | | runoff primary elections of all of the subdivisions applicable to |
---|
64 | 64 | | the effective date of a plan shall apply. The county chair shall |
---|
65 | 65 | | conduct the drawing to determine the order of the candidates' names |
---|
66 | 66 | | on the general primary election ballot in accordance with Section |
---|
67 | 67 | | 172.082(c) after the date of the applicable filing deadline. |
---|
68 | 68 | | (e) If a redistricting plan to which this section applies |
---|
69 | 69 | | has not become law on or before February 14, 2022, the secretary of |
---|
70 | 70 | | state shall set the dates of the filing period and the general and |
---|
71 | 71 | | runoff primary elections for the election of officers of the |
---|
72 | 72 | | districts to which this section applies. In setting dates under |
---|
73 | 73 | | this section, the secretary of state shall ensure the efficient and |
---|
74 | 74 | | orderly administration of elections and shall, to the extent |
---|
75 | 75 | | practicable, set dates in a manner that allows the same interval of |
---|
76 | 76 | | time in relation to the date of the election as would be provided by |
---|
77 | 77 | | the application of other law. |
---|
78 | 78 | | (f) A date set for the general primary election under |
---|
79 | 79 | | Subsection (c) or (d) shall be the date of any general or primary |
---|
80 | 80 | | election held under this code. |
---|
81 | 81 | | (g) Except as provided by this section, the secretary of |
---|
82 | 82 | | state shall adjust the schedule for canvassing election returns, |
---|
83 | 83 | | declaring results, or performing any other official act relating to |
---|
84 | 84 | | an election held on a date under this section as necessary for the |
---|
85 | 85 | | efficient and orderly administration of the election. To the |
---|
86 | 86 | | extent practicable, the secretary of state shall adjust schedules |
---|
87 | 87 | | under this subsection in a manner that allows the same interval of |
---|
88 | 88 | | time in relation to the date of the election as would be provided by |
---|
89 | 89 | | the application of other law. |
---|
90 | 90 | | (h) This section expires January 1, 2023. |
---|
91 | 91 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
92 | 92 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
93 | 93 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
94 | 94 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
95 | 95 | | Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the |
---|
96 | 96 | | legislative session. |
---|