Texas 2021 - 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas House Bill HB15 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 08/09/2021

                            87S20441 TSS-D
 By: Hunter H.B. No. 15


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to dates of certain elections to be held in 2022.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 41, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 41.0075 to read as follows:
 Sec. 41.0075.  PRIMARY ELECTION: TEMPORARY PROVISION.  (a)
 This section supersedes any conflicting statute with respect to a
 primary election to be held in 2022.
 (b)  For the purposes of this section, a redistricting plan
 "becomes law" on the earlier of:
 (1)  the date the governor signs an Act of the 87th
 Legislature relating to the composition of the State Board of
 Education, state legislative, or federal congressional districts;
 or
 (2)  the date on which the time for gubernatorial
 action on an Act of the 87th Legislature relating to the composition
 of the State Board of Education, state legislative, or federal
 congressional districts expires under Section 14, Article IV, Texas
 Constitution.
 (c)  If a redistricting plan adopted following the 2020
 federal census by the 87th Legislature that includes a State Board
 of Education, state legislative, or federal congressional district
 becomes law:
 (1)  on or before November 22, 2021, the following
 dates related to the primary election for the election of officers
 for the district shall apply:
 (A)  an application for a place on the general
 primary election ballot must be filed not earlier than November 29,
 2021, and not later than 6 p.m. on December 13, 2021;
 (B)  the general primary election date is March 1,
 2022; and
 (C)  the runoff primary election date is May 24,
 2022;
 (2)  after November 22, 2021, and on or before January
 3, 2022, the following dates related to the primary election for the
 election of officers for the district shall apply:
 (A)  an application for a place on the general
 primary election ballot must be filed not earlier than January 10,
 2022, and not later than 6 p.m. on January 24, 2022;
 (B)  the general primary election date is April 5,
 2022; and
 (C)  the runoff primary election date is June 21,
 2022; and
 (3)  after January 3, 2022, and on or before February
 14, 2022, the following dates related to the primary election for
 the election of officers for the district shall apply:
 (A)  an application for a place on the general
 primary election ballot must be filed not earlier than February 21,
 2022, and not later than 6 p.m. on March 7, 2022;
 (B)  the general primary election date is May 24,
 2022; and
 (C)  the runoff primary election date is July 26,
 2022.
 (d)  If a plan for a State Board of Education, state
 legislative, or federal congressional district becomes law on dates
 included under more than one subdivision of Subsection (c), the
 latest dates provided for the filing period and the general and
 runoff primary elections of all of the subdivisions applicable to
 the effective date of a plan shall apply. The county chair shall
 conduct the drawing to determine the order of the candidates' names
 on the general primary election ballot in accordance with Section
 172.082(c) after the date of the applicable filing deadline.
 (e)  If a redistricting plan to which this section applies
 has not become law on or before February 14, 2022, the secretary of
 state shall set the dates of the filing period and the general and
 runoff primary elections for the election of officers of the
 districts to which this section applies.  In setting dates under
 this section, the secretary of state shall ensure the efficient and
 orderly administration of elections and shall, to the extent
 practicable, set dates in a manner that allows the same interval of
 time in relation to the date of the election as would be provided by
 the application of other law.
 (f)  A date set for the general primary election under
 Subsection (c) or (d) shall be the date of any general or primary
 election held under this code.
 (g)  Except as provided by this section, the secretary of
 state shall adjust the schedule for canvassing election returns,
 declaring results, or performing any other official act relating to
 an election held on a date under this section as necessary for the
 efficient and orderly administration of the election.  To the
 extent practicable, the secretary of state shall adjust schedules
 under this subsection in a manner that allows the same interval of
 time in relation to the date of the election as would be provided by
 the application of other law.
 (h)  This section expires January 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the
 legislative session.