House | 09/02/2021 | Postponed 9/26/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 09/02/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 09/02/2021 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 09/01/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 08/30/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 08/30/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 08/30/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 08/30/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 08/30/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 08/30/2021 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 08/27/2021 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | ||
House | 08/27/2021 | Read first time | ||
House | 08/25/2021 | Filed |