Texas 2021 - 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR172 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/08/2021

                            H.R. No. 172


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Words cannot express the sorrow felt at the loss of
 Sergeant Christopher Ray Wilson of the Texas Parks and Wildlife
 Department, who passed away on August 26, 2021, at the age of 43;
 and
 WHEREAS, Chris Wilson was born on December 11, 1977; after
 graduating from Cameron High School in Milam County, he studied and
 played football at Tarleton State University and Sam Houston State
 University, earning his bachelor's degree in kinesiology with a
 minor in history from SHSU; and
 WHEREAS, On January 1, 2004, Mr. Wilson graduated as a member
 of the 50th Game Warden Cadet Class, and he began his TPWD career as
 a game warden in San Saba County before moving to Bell County; in
 December 2016, he was promoted to sergeant special investigator
 with responsibility for investigating complex environmental crimes
 as well as threats against game wardens and park police officers;
 and
 WHEREAS, Sergeant Wilson's warm smile and calm strength
 served him well in his work, enabling him to pacify difficult
 situations in the field and earning him the respect and admiration
 of the public and his fellow officers; and
 WHEREAS, Although he was taken much too soon, Chris Wilson
 leaves behind a legacy of valiant and dedicated service that will
 continue to inspire all those who knew and loved him; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the memory
 of Sergeant Christopher Ray Wilson and extend heartfelt sympathy to
 the members of his family: to his children, Tristen, Colby, Tyler,
 and Hailey; to his parents, Warren and Mary Ann Rinn; and to his
 other relatives, his colleagues, and his many friends; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Sergeant
 Wilson.
 Shine
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 172 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on September 2, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House