Texas 2021 - 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR176 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.R. No. 176
1+87S21347 JGH-D
2+ By: Crockett H.R. No. 176
23
34
45 R E S O L U T I O N
56 WHEREAS, Officer Mitchell Aaron Penton of the Dallas Police
67 Department is being posthumously honored with a Star of Texas Award
7- on September 10, 2021, at a ceremony in Austin; and
8+ on September 11, 2021, at a ceremony in Austin; and
89 WHEREAS, Established by the 78th Texas Legislature in 2003,
910 the Star of Texas Awards annually recognize first responders who
1011 have been seriously injured or killed in the line of duty;
1112 recipients are selected by three advisory committees appointed by
1213 the governor; and
1314 WHEREAS, On February 13, 2021, Officer Penton responded to a
1415 collision on the North Central Expressway; as he was securing
1516 traffic at the scene, a drunk driver hit his patrol car, which in
1617 turn struck Officer Penton; he later died of his injuries at Baylor
1718 University Medical Center; he was 27 years old; and
1819 WHEREAS, Born in Arlington on March 29, 1993, Mitchell Penton
1920 was the son of Timothy and Kathy Penton, and he grew up with two
2021 siblings, Garrett and Sydney; he earned his bachelor's degree in
2122 criminal justice from Rogers State University in 2015 and graduated
2223 from the police academy in 2019 before beginning his service with
2324 the Northeast Patrol Division; devoted to his loved ones, he
2425 married Noel Bergenske Penton in October 2020; the couple were
2526 raising a son, Cashton, and were expecting another child at the time
2627 of Officer Penton's death; and
2728 WHEREAS, Texans owe an immense debt of gratitude to the men
2829 and women of the law enforcement profession who willingly place
2930 themselves in harm's way to protect and serve the public, and the
3031 presentation of a Star of Texas Award in memory of Officer Penton
3132 ensures that his dedication and sacrifice will not be forgotten;
3233 now, therefore, be it
3334 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
3435 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of
3536 Officer Mitchell Aaron Penton and commemorate his posthumous
3637 receipt of a Star of Texas Award; and, be it further
3738 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
3839 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
3940 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Officer
4041 Penton.
41- Crockett
42- ______________________________
43- Speaker of the House
44- I certify that H.R. No. 176 was adopted by the House on
45- September 2, 2021, by a non-record vote.
46- ______________________________
47- Chief Clerk of the House