Texas 2021 - 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR176 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/08/2021

                            H.R. No. 176


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Officer Mitchell Aaron Penton of the Dallas Police
 Department is being posthumously honored with a Star of Texas Award
 on September 10, 2021, at a ceremony in Austin; and
 WHEREAS, Established by the 78th Texas Legislature in 2003,
 the Star of Texas Awards annually recognize first responders who
 have been seriously injured or killed in the line of duty;
 recipients are selected by three advisory committees appointed by
 the governor; and
 WHEREAS, On February 13, 2021, Officer Penton responded to a
 collision on the North Central Expressway; as he was securing
 traffic at the scene, a drunk driver hit his patrol car, which in
 turn struck Officer Penton; he later died of his injuries at Baylor
 University Medical Center; he was 27 years old; and
 WHEREAS, Born in Arlington on March 29, 1993, Mitchell Penton
 was the son of Timothy and Kathy Penton, and he grew up with two
 siblings, Garrett and Sydney; he earned his bachelor's degree in
 criminal justice from Rogers State University in 2015 and graduated
 from the police academy in 2019 before beginning his service with
 the Northeast Patrol Division; devoted to his loved ones, he
 married Noel Bergenske Penton in October 2020; the couple were
 raising a son, Cashton, and were expecting another child at the time
 of Officer Penton's death; and
 WHEREAS, Texans owe an immense debt of gratitude to the men
 and women of the law enforcement profession who willingly place
 themselves in harm's way to protect and serve the public, and the
 presentation of a Star of Texas Award in memory of Officer Penton
 ensures that his dedication and sacrifice will not be forgotten;
 now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature, 2nd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life of
 Officer Mitchell Aaron Penton and commemorate his posthumous
 receipt of a Star of Texas Award; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Officer
 Penton.
 Crockett
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 176 was adopted by the House on
 September 2, 2021, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House