Senate | 09/02/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
House | 08/31/2021 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 08/31/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 08/31/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 08/24/2021 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 08/24/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 08/24/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 08/19/2021 | Referred to Public Education | ||
House | 08/19/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
House | 08/19/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 08/11/2021 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 08/11/2021 | Passed | ||
Senate | 08/11/2021 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 08/11/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 08/11/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 08/10/2021 | Remarks ordered printed | ||
Senate | 08/10/2021 | Passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 08/10/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 08/09/2021 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 08/09/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 08/09/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 08/08/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 08/07/2021 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 08/07/2021 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 08/06/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 08/06/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |