Texas 2021 - 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB2 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 6, 2021

Engrossed

Bill August 11, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note August 23, 2021
Fiscal Note August 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill August 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis August 7, 2021