|
09/17/2021
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
|
09/17/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
09/01/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
09/01/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
09/01/2021
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Statement(s) submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2021
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2021
|
Record vote RV#97
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2021
|
Passed as amended
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2021
|
Amended 1-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Record vote RV#91
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Record vote RV#90
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 9-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Amended 8-Clardy
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Record vote RV#89
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 7-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Amended 6-A. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-A. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Amended 4-Smith
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Amended 3-Smith
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended 1-Smith
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Amendment amended 2-Moody
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Smith
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Postponed 8/27/21 8:30 PM
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
08/26/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
08/26/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
08/25/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
08/25/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
08/23/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
08/23/2021
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
08/23/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
08/21/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
08/21/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
08/21/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
08/19/2021
|
Referred to Constitutional Rights & Remedies
|
|
|
House
|
08/19/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
08/19/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|