Texas 2021 - 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB6 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 7, 2021

Engrossed

Bill August 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis September 7, 2021
Analysis August 25, 2021
Analysis August 7, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note August 31, 2021
Fiscal Note August 24, 2021
Fiscal Note August 20, 2021
Fiscal Note August 7, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill August 25, 2021
Bill August 7, 2021