Senate
|
08/31/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2021
|
Record vote RV#116
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2021
|
Failed of adoption
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2021
|
Amended 1-Kacal
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2021
|
Postponed 8/30/21 4:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2021
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
08/30/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Record vote RV#82
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Amended 2-Dominguez
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Record vote RV#81
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 1-A. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Postponed 8/27/21 3:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-A. Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
08/27/2021
|
Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
08/26/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
08/23/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
08/23/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
08/20/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
08/20/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
08/20/2021
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
08/20/2021
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
08/19/2021
|
Referred to Constitutional Rights & Remedies
|
|
|
House
|
08/19/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
08/19/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2021
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2021
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/09/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|